U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00251
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 02, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.