U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Davis v. City of Albuquerque et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: [Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 13, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.