U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Clark v. Coleman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.