U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00281
  • Case Name: Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Davey Resource Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.