U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Star Paving Company v. Monitor Construction, INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.