U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00126
  • Case Name: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. OnPointe Management, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2025: [Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Default Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.