U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01136
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.