U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Romero v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Issued]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Cure Defects]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.