U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00477
  • Case Name: Long et al v. LNU et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 09, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proceed 28 U.S.C. 1915]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.