U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00971
  • Case Name: Doe et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.