U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00590
  • Case Name: Escano v. Liberty Insurance Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.