U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00562
  • Case Name: Point Contracting, LLC v. Urban Investment Research Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.