U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00277
  • Case Name: Roybal et al v. Brownridge et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.