U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01082
  • Case Name: Saul v. U.S. Bank National Association
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.