U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00231
  • Case Name: Volk v. Kumar et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.