U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01311
  • Case Name: Leonard et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.