U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00876
  • Case Name: Ortiz v. SFM, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.