U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01087
  • Case Name: Assed et al v. American Economy Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.