U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00647
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 2022 Dodge Durango SRT 392
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.