U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01193
  • Case Name: Aceves v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.