U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00986
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Chenot et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Reassign Case]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Review]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reassign Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Review]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.