U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Padilla v. Woodard
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.