U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Porwitzky et al v. Romkowsky et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.