U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00504
  • Case Name: Cooper v. City of Gallup NM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.