U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00055
  • Case Name: The Navajo Nation v. The United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.