U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Smith v. RationalMedia Foundation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Unexecuted]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Errata]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 27, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.