U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00625
  • Case Name: Smith v. Christmas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 28, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.