U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00105
  • Case Name: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Genesis Healthcare, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.