U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01118
  • Case Name: Cash et al v. Intrepid Potash, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.