U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00903
  • Case Name: San Miguel Hospital Corporation v. Johnson & Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.