U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00032
  • Case Name: McNeill et al v. Loewen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdraw Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.