U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Cayaditto v. Howell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.