U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00287
  • Case Name: Cataldo v. Monarch Properties, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.