U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01098
  • Case Name: West v. Beazley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Witness List]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.