U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Leitch et al v. Castillo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.