U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00680
  • Case Name: Garcia et al v. Will Transport American Corp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • March 20, 2025: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.