U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00885
  • Case Name: Pulte Homes of New Mexico, Inc. et al v. American Fire & Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.