U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01313
  • Case Name: Narcisse v. Virgin Galactic et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Association Dues Received]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.