U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00505
  • Case Name: Douglas v. The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.