U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00296
  • Case Name: Pueblo of San Felipe v. Haaland et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Clarify]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.