U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Cruz et al v. Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.