U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10363-t7
  • Case Name: Richard Jesse Ramirez, III
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [none]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Signature Page]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Intention]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.