U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10367-t13
  • Case Name: Eduardo Headley Reyes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [341 Chapter 13 - Concluded]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Schedules, Summaries & Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Extend/ShortenTime (Motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Deficiency Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information on Requestor]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.