U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10364-j13
  • Case Name: Samuel L. Credit, Jr. and Kristin M. Credit
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Rescheduling Hearing (Order)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Intent to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Req Docs (Notice)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors - (text entry only)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice - with Forms)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Dismiss Case (Trustee/UST Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry (Public - NEF will go to all parties)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Deficiency Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Affidavit/Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Valuation (BIF) (Motion)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.