U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00035
  • Case Name: White et al v. Maverick Natural Resources et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.