U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01312
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Otero County Board of Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Jury Demand]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.