U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10375-7
  • Case Name: Kirk O Jumpp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Notice of Error]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Signature Page]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.