U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10387-t7
  • Case Name: Vanessa N. Tapia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Change to Meeting of Creditors - Ch 7/11 (Notice)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Abandonment of Property (Motion to Compel) (filed with motion for relief from stay)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Stay (Motion for Relief)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC - request for delivery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Intention]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [none]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.