U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10383-j7
  • Case Name: Esther Castillo Gonzalez and Alfredo Gonzalez Tello
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [none]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.