U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10377-t7
  • Case Name: Martin Mata Blanco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Change to Meeting of Creditors - Ch 7/11 (Notice)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.